House | 04/07/2025 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {473628/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/20/2025 | First Reading Judiciary |