Senate | 03/18/2025 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Third Reading Passed (136-2) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {543228/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | First Reading Ways and Means |