Maryland 2025 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB771 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/14/2025

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0771*  
  
HOUSE BILL 771 
F1   	5lr1191 
HB 167/24 – W&M     
By: Delegate Harrison 
Introduced and read first time: January 29, 2025 
Assigned to: Ways and Means 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 4, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Student Health – Program for Student Dental Health – Established 2 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring, beginning in a certain school year, certain students to submit 3 
a certificate of dental health to their school on a certain schedule; requiring the State 4 
Department of Education to support and facilitate each county board of education in 5 
publishing certain information on dental health in a certain manner; requiring the 6 
Maryland Department of Health to establish a program for student dental health; 7 
requiring the Department to develop a certificate of dental health for use in public 8 
schools; and generally relating to a program for student dental health.  9 
 
BY adding to 10 
 Article – Education 11 
Section 7–402.1 12 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 13 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 14 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 15 
 Article – Education 16 
 Section 4–111.2 17 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 18 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement)  19 
 
BY adding to 20 
 Article – Health – General 21  2 	HOUSE BILL 771  
 
 
Section 20–2302 to be under the amended subtitle “Subtitle 23. Dental Health 1 
Programs” 2 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 3 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 4 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 5 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 6 
 
Article – Education 7 
 
7–402.1. 8 
 
 BEGINNING IN THE 2027–2028 SCHOOL YEAR , EACH STUDENT ENROLLE D IN A 9 
PUBLIC ELEMENTARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL IN THE STATE SHALL SUBMIT TO THE 10 
SCHOOL A CERTIFICATE OF DENTAL HEALTH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROGRAM 11 
FOR STUDENT DENTAL H EALTH ESTABLISHED UN DER § 20–2302 OF THE HEALTH – 12 
GENERAL ARTICLE, ON A SCHEDULE ESTABL ISHED BY THE DEPARTMENT . 13 
 
4–111.2. 14 
 
 The Department shall: 15 
 
 (1) Support and facilitate oral health education, including oral disease 16 
prevention and dental health promotion, in every county; 17 
 
 (2) Develop a process to monitor implementation of oral health education; 18 
[and] 19 
 
 (3) SUPPORT AND FACILITAT E EACH COUNTY BOARD IN PUBLISHING 20 
INFORMATION ON STUDE NT DENTAL HEALTH THA T IS CREATED BY THE PROGRAM 21 
FOR STUDENT DENTAL H EALTH UNDER § 20–2302 OF THE HEALTH – GENERAL 22 
ARTICLE ON THE LOCAL SCHOOL SYSTEM ’S WEBSITE AND IN STU DENT HANDBOOKS ; 23 
AND 24 
 
 [(3)] (4) On or before December 1, 2015, and every 5 years thereafter, 25 
submit to the Governor and, subject to § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 26 
General Assembly a summary of the information reported by the Department to the State 27 
Superintendent during the certification of the Health Education State Curriculum.  28 
 
Article – Health – General 29 
 
Subtitle 23. [Plain Language] Dental HEALTH [Information] PROGRAMS. 30 
 
20–2302. 31 
   	HOUSE BILL 771 	3 
 
 
 (A) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ESTA BLISH A PROGRAM FOR STUDENT 1 
DENTAL HEALTH . 2 
 
 (B) THE DEPARTMENT’S PROGRAM SHALL INCL UDE:  3 
 
 (1) STANDARDS FOR THE RECOMMENDED PERIODIC DENTAL 4 
EXAMINATIONS OF STUD ENTS; AND 5 
 
 (2) THE CREATION OF A CER TIFICATE OF DENTAL H EALTH THAT CAN 6 
BE USED BY PUBLIC SC HOOLS IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 7–402.1 OF THE EDUCATION 7 
ARTICLE;  8 
 
 (3) THE CREATION OF A STA NDARD FORM TO BE USE D BY HEALTH 9 
CARE PRACTITIONERS , PARENTS, AND SCHOOLS TO CERTI FY A STUDENT’S DENTAL 10 
HEALTH; AND 11 
 
 (4) INFORMATION FOR STUDE NTS AND PARENTS ON : 12 
 
 (I) HOW TO FIND INSURANCE THAT WILL COVER DENT AL 13 
HEALTH CARE; 14 
 
 (II) LISTS OF PEDIATRIC DE NTISTS LOCATED IN AREAS 15 
DIFFERENT REGIONS OF THE STATE; AND 16 
 
 (III) THE IMPORTANCE OF DEN TAL HEALTH TO A STUD ENT’S 17 
OVERALL HEALTH AND W ELL–BEING. 18 
 
 (C) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL IMPL EMENT ITS PROGRAM ON A SCHEDULE 19 
THAT ALLOWS EACH STUDENT TO SUBMIT A CERTIFIC ATE OF DENTAL HEALTH TO 20 
THE STUDENT ’S PUBLIC SCHOOL BEGI NNING IN THE 2027–2028 SCHOOL YEAR , IN 21 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 7–402.1 OF THE EDUCATION ARTICLE. 22 
 
 (D) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ADOP T REGULATIONS TO CAR RY OUT THIS 23 
SECTION. 24 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 25 
October 1, 2025. 26