House
|
04/07/2025
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
House Concurs Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {163523/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2025
|
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {163523/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments {723727/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
First Reading Ways and Means
|
|
|