Senate | 03/31/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {143320/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/09/2025 | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |