Maryland 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB50 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/20/2025

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0050*  
  
SENATE BILL 50 
L2   	5lr0735 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 469 
By: Senator Simonaire Senators Simonaire, Gile, Henson, Lam, and Rosapepe 
Requested: September 2, 2024 
Introduced and read first time: January 8, 2025 
Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 9, 2025 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Local Government – Annapolis and Anne Arundel County Conference and 2 
Visitors Bureau Designation 3 
 
FOR the purpose of altering references to the Annapolis and Anne Arundel County 4 
Conference and Visitors Bureau to be Visit Annapolis and Anne Arundel County, 5 
Inc.; and generally relating to the Annapolis and Anne Arundel County Conference 6 
and Visitors Bureau. 7 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 8 
 Article – Local Government 9 
Section 20–603(b)(4), (c)(1), and (e) 10 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 11 
 (2013 Volume and 2024 Supplement) 12 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 13 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 14 
 
Article – Local Government 15 
 
20–603. 16 
 
 (b) (4) From any revenue generated in the City of Annapolis from the hotel 17 
tax, Anne Arundel County shall distribute: 18 
  2 	SENATE BILL 50  
 
 
 (i) 3% to a special fund to be used only to provide funds to the 1 
Annapolis Art in Public Places Commission; 2 
 
 (ii) 3% to a special fund to be used only to provide funds to the Arts 3 
Council of Anne Arundel County, Inc.; 4 
 
 (iii) 17% to a special fund to be used only to provide funds to [the 5 
Annapolis and Anne Arundel County Conference and Visitors Bureau] VISIT ANNAPOLIS 6 
AND ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY, INC.; and 7 
 
 (iv) 3% to the Affordable Housing Trust Fund established under § 8 
20.30.070 of the Code of the City of Annapolis to be used only for housing assistance 9 
payments. 10 
 
 (c) (1) From the county’s share of revenue from the hotel tax, Anne Arundel 11 
County shall distribute: 12 
 
 (i) 3% to a special fund to be used only to provide funds to the Arts 13 
Council of Anne Arundel County, Inc.; and 14 
 
 (ii) 17% to a special fund to be used only to provide funds to [the 15 
Annapolis and Anne Arundel County Conference and Visitors Bureau] VISIT ANNAPOLIS 16 
AND ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY, INC. 17 
 
 (e) (1) On or before November 1 each year, the Arts Council of Anne Arundel 18 
County, Inc. and [the Annapolis and Anne Arundel County Conference and Visitors 19 
Bureau] VISIT ANNAPOLIS AND ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY, INC. shall report on their 20 
use of hotel tax revenue during the preceding fiscal year to: 21 
 
 (i) the Anne Arundel County Executive; 22 
 
 (ii) the Mayor and City Council of the City of Annapolis; and 23 
 
 (iii) in accordance with § 2–1257 of the State Government Article, the 24 
Senate Budget and Taxation Committee, the House Committee on Ways and Means, and 25 
the members of the General Assembly representing Anne Arundel County. 26 
 
 (2) The County Auditor of Anne Arundel County: 27 
 
 (i) may conduct an audit of the financial records of the Arts Council 28 
of Anne Arundel County, Inc. or [the Annapolis and Anne Arundel County Conference and 29 
Visitors Bureau] VISIT ANNAPOLIS AND ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY, INC.; and 30 
 
 (ii) shall report any audit findings under item (i) of this paragraph 31 
to the governing body of Anne Arundel County. 32 
   	SENATE BILL 50 	3 
 
 
 (3) (i) The City of Annapolis or Anne Arundel County may withhold 1 
from appropriation special funds dedicated to the Arts Council of Anne Arundel County 2 
under this section if the Council fails to: 3 
 
 1. submit the report required under paragraph (1) of this 4 
subsection; or 5 
 
 2. correct any audit findings identified under paragraph (2) 6 
of this subsection. 7 
 
 (ii) The City of Annapolis or Anne Arundel County may withhold 8 
from appropriation special funds dedicated to [the Annapolis and Anne Arundel County 9 
Conference and Visitors Bureau] VISIT ANNAPOLIS AND ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY, 10 
INC. under this section if [the Bureau] VISIT ANNAPOLIS AND ANNE ARUNDEL 11 
COUNTY, INC. fails to: 12 
 
 1. submit the report required under paragraph (1) of this 13 
subsection; or 14 
 
 2. correct any audit findings identified under paragraph (2) 15 
of this subsection. 16 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACT ED, That this Act shall take effect 17 
October 1, 2025.  18 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.