1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *sb0508* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | SENATE BILL 508 |
---|
8 | 8 | | J5, J1, J4 5lr3070 |
---|
9 | 9 | | CF HB 381 |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Senator Henson |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: January 23, 2025 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Finance |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Required 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Coverage for Aesthetic Services and Restorative Care for Victims of Domestic 3 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Violence 4 |
---|
21 | 21 | | (Healing Our Scars Act) 5 |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and certain 6 |
---|
24 | 24 | | insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, and 7 |
---|
25 | 25 | | managed care organizations to provide coverage to victims of domestic violence for 8 |
---|
26 | 26 | | certain aesthetic services and restorative care; and generally relating to coverage for 9 |
---|
27 | 27 | | aesthetic services and restorative care for victims of domestic violence by the 10 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Maryland Medical Assistance Program and health insurance carriers. 11 |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 |
---|
31 | 31 | | Article – Family Law 13 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Section 4–501(a) and (d) and 4–513 14 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 15 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2019 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 16 |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | BY adding to 17 |
---|
37 | 37 | | Article – Health – General 18 |
---|
38 | 38 | | Section 15–102.3(m) and 15–103(a)(2)(xxv) 19 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 20 |
---|
40 | 40 | | (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 21 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 22 |
---|
43 | 43 | | Article – Health – General 23 |
---|
44 | 44 | | Section 15–103(a)(1) 24 |
---|
45 | 45 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 25 |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 26 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 27 2 SENATE BILL 508 |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | Article – Health – General 1 |
---|
52 | 52 | | Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxiii) and (xxiv) 2 |
---|
53 | 53 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 3 |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 4 |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | BY adding to 5 |
---|
57 | 57 | | Article – Insurance 6 |
---|
58 | 58 | | Section 15–861 7 |
---|
59 | 59 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 8 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (2017 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 9 |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 |
---|
63 | 63 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | Article – Family Law 12 |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | 4–501. 13 |
---|
68 | 68 | | |
---|
69 | 69 | | (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 14 |
---|
70 | 70 | | |
---|
71 | 71 | | (d) “Cohabitant” means a person who has had a sexual relationship with the 15 |
---|
72 | 72 | | respondent and resided with the respondent in the home for a period of at least 90 days 16 |
---|
73 | 73 | | within 1 year before the filing of the petition. 17 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | 4–513. 18 |
---|
76 | 76 | | |
---|
77 | 77 | | In this Part III of this subtitle, “victim of domestic violence” means an individual 19 |
---|
78 | 78 | | who has received deliberate, severe, and demonstrable physical injury, or is in fear of 20 |
---|
79 | 79 | | imminent deliberate, severe, and demonstrable physical injury from a current or former 21 |
---|
80 | 80 | | spouse, or a current or former cohabitant, as defined in § 4–501 of this subtitle. 22 |
---|
81 | 81 | | |
---|
82 | 82 | | Article – Health – General 23 |
---|
83 | 83 | | |
---|
84 | 84 | | 15–102.3. 24 |
---|
85 | 85 | | |
---|
86 | 86 | | (M) THE PROVISIONS OF § 15–861 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE APPLY TO 25 |
---|
87 | 87 | | MANAGED CARE ORGANIZ ATIONS IN THE SAME M ANNER THEY APPLY TO CARRIERS. 26 |
---|
88 | 88 | | |
---|
89 | 89 | | 15–103. 27 |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|
91 | 91 | | (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 28 |
---|
92 | 92 | | Program. 29 |
---|
93 | 93 | | |
---|
94 | 94 | | (2) The Program: 30 |
---|
95 | 95 | | SENATE BILL 508 3 |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | |
---|
98 | 98 | | (xxiii) Beginning on July 1, 2025, shall provide, subject to the 1 |
---|
99 | 99 | | limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for biomarker 2 |
---|
100 | 100 | | testing in accordance with § 15–859 of the Insurance Article; [and] 3 |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | (xxiv) Beginning on January 1, 2025, shall provide coverage for 4 |
---|
103 | 103 | | prostheses in accordance with § 15–844 of the Insurance Article; AND 5 |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | (XXV) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2026, SHALL PROVIDE 6 |
---|
106 | 106 | | COVERAGE TO VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FOR AESTHETIC SERVIC ES AND 7 |
---|
107 | 107 | | RESTORATIVE CARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–861 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE. 8 |
---|
108 | 108 | | |
---|
109 | 109 | | Article – Insurance 9 |
---|
110 | 110 | | |
---|
111 | 111 | | 15–861. 10 |
---|
112 | 112 | | |
---|
113 | 113 | | (A) IN THIS SECTION, “VICTIM OF DOMESTIC V IOLENCE” HAS THE MEANING 11 |
---|
114 | 114 | | STATED IN § 4–513 OF THE FAMILY LAW ARTICLE. 12 |
---|
115 | 115 | | |
---|
116 | 116 | | (B) THIS SECTION APPLIES TO: 13 |
---|
117 | 117 | | |
---|
118 | 118 | | (1) INSURERS AND NONPROFIT HEALTH SERVICE PLANS THAT 14 |
---|
119 | 119 | | PROVIDE HOSPITAL , MEDICAL, OR SURGICAL BENEFITS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GR OUPS 15 |
---|
120 | 120 | | ON AN EXPENSE –INCURRED BASIS UNDER HEALTH INSURANCE POL ICIES OR 16 |
---|
121 | 121 | | CONTRACTS THAT ARE I SSUED OR DELIVERED I N THE STATE; AND 17 |
---|
122 | 122 | | |
---|
123 | 123 | | (2) HEALTH MA INTENANCE ORGANIZATI ONS THAT PROVIDE 18 |
---|
124 | 124 | | HOSPITAL, MEDICAL, OR SURGICAL BENEFITS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GR OUPS UNDER 19 |
---|
125 | 125 | | CONTRACTS THAT ARE I SSUED OR DELIVERED I N THE STATE. 20 |
---|
126 | 126 | | |
---|
127 | 127 | | (C) AN ENTITY SUBJECT TO THIS SECTION SHALL P ROVIDE COVERAGE TO 21 |
---|
128 | 128 | | VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FOR AESTHETIC SERVIC ES AND RESTORATIVE 22 |
---|
129 | 129 | | CARE: 23 |
---|
130 | 130 | | |
---|
131 | 131 | | (1) PROVIDED FOR THE TRE ATMENT OF PHYSICAL I NJURIES CAUSED 24 |
---|
132 | 132 | | BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ; AND 25 |
---|
133 | 133 | | |
---|
134 | 134 | | (2) DETERMINED TO BE MED ICALLY NECESSARY BY A PHYSICIAN WHO 26 |
---|
135 | 135 | | IS LICENSED TO PRACT ICE MEDICINE UNDER T HE HEALTH OCCUPATIONS ARTICLE. 27 |
---|
136 | 136 | | |
---|
137 | 137 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall apply to all 28 |
---|
138 | 138 | | policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or 29 |
---|
139 | 139 | | after January 1, 2026. 30 |
---|
140 | 140 | | 4 SENATE BILL 508 |
---|
141 | 141 | | |
---|
142 | 142 | | |
---|
143 | 143 | | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1 |
---|
144 | 144 | | January 1, 2026. 2 |
---|
145 | 145 | | |
---|