Maryland 2025 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB508 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/24/2025

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0508*  
  
SENATE BILL 508 
J5, J1, J4   	5lr3070 
    	CF HB 381 
By: Senator Henson 
Introduced and read first time: January 23, 2025 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance – Required 2 
Coverage for Aesthetic Services and Restorative Care for Victims of Domestic 3 
Violence 4 
(Healing Our Scars Act) 5 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and certain 6 
insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, and 7 
managed care organizations to provide coverage to victims of domestic violence for 8 
certain aesthetic services and restorative care; and generally relating to coverage for 9 
aesthetic services and restorative care for victims of domestic violence by the 10 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and health insurance carriers. 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 
 Article – Family Law 13 
Section 4–501(a) and (d) and 4–513 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – Health – General 18 
Section 15–102.3(m) and 15–103(a)(2)(xxv) 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 21 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 22 
 Article – Health – General 23 
Section 15–103(a)(1) 24 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 25 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 26 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 27  2 	SENATE BILL 508  
 
 
 Article – Health – General 1 
Section 15–103(a)(2)(xxiii) and (xxiv) 2 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 3 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 4 
 
BY adding to 5 
 Article – Insurance 6 
Section 15–861 7 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 8 
 (2017 Replacement Volume and 2024 Supplement) 9 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 10 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 11 
 
Article – Family Law 12 
 
4–501. 13 
 
 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 14 
 
 (d) “Cohabitant” means a person who has had a sexual relationship with the 15 
respondent and resided with the respondent in the home for a period of at least 90 days 16 
within 1 year before the filing of the petition. 17 
 
4–513. 18 
 
 In this Part III of this subtitle, “victim of domestic violence” means an individual 19 
who has received deliberate, severe, and demonstrable physical injury, or is in fear of 20 
imminent deliberate, severe, and demonstrable physical injury from a current or former 21 
spouse, or a current or former cohabitant, as defined in § 4–501 of this subtitle. 22 
 
Article – Health – General 23 
 
15–102.3. 24 
 
 (M) THE PROVISIONS OF § 15–861 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE APPLY TO 25 
MANAGED CARE ORGANIZ ATIONS IN THE SAME M ANNER THEY APPLY TO CARRIERS. 26 
 
15–103. 27 
 
 (a) (1) The Secretary shall administer the Maryland Medical Assistance 28 
Program. 29 
 
 (2) The Program: 30 
   	SENATE BILL 508 	3 
 
 
 (xxiii) Beginning on July 1, 2025, shall provide, subject to the 1 
limitations of the State budget, and as permitted by federal law, coverage for biomarker 2 
testing in accordance with § 15–859 of the Insurance Article; [and] 3 
 
 (xxiv) Beginning on January 1, 2025, shall provide coverage for 4 
prostheses in accordance with § 15–844 of the Insurance Article; AND 5 
 
 (XXV) BEGINNING ON JANUARY 1, 2026, SHALL PROVIDE 6 
COVERAGE TO VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FOR AESTHETIC SERVIC ES AND 7 
RESTORATIVE CARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 15–861 OF THE INSURANCE ARTICLE. 8 
 
Article – Insurance 9 
 
15–861. 10 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “VICTIM OF DOMESTIC V IOLENCE” HAS THE MEANING 11 
STATED IN § 4–513 OF THE FAMILY LAW ARTICLE. 12 
 
 (B) THIS SECTION APPLIES TO: 13 
 
 (1) INSURERS AND NONPROFIT HEALTH SERVICE PLANS THAT 14 
PROVIDE HOSPITAL , MEDICAL, OR SURGICAL BENEFITS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GR OUPS 15 
ON AN EXPENSE –INCURRED BASIS UNDER HEALTH INSURANCE POL ICIES OR 16 
CONTRACTS THAT ARE I SSUED OR DELIVERED I N THE STATE; AND 17 
 
 (2) HEALTH MA INTENANCE ORGANIZATI ONS THAT PROVIDE 18 
HOSPITAL, MEDICAL, OR SURGICAL BENEFITS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GR OUPS UNDER 19 
CONTRACTS THAT ARE I SSUED OR DELIVERED I N THE STATE. 20 
 
 (C) AN ENTITY SUBJECT TO THIS SECTION SHALL P ROVIDE COVERAGE TO 21 
VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FOR AESTHETIC SERVIC ES AND RESTORATIVE 22 
CARE: 23 
 
 (1) PROVIDED FOR THE TRE ATMENT OF PHYSICAL I NJURIES CAUSED 24 
BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ; AND 25 
 
 (2) DETERMINED TO BE MED ICALLY NECESSARY BY A PHYSICIAN WHO 26 
IS LICENSED TO PRACT ICE MEDICINE UNDER T HE HEALTH OCCUPATIONS ARTICLE. 27 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall apply to all 28 
policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or 29 
after January 1, 2026. 30 
  4 	SENATE BILL 508  
 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 1 
January 1, 2026. 2