Senate | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (113-24) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {993224/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:05 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |