Senate | 03/31/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Judicial Proceedings |