Senate | 05/09/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 05/04/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 04/28/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 04/28/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |