Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-593), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593).
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/20/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/30/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/30/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|