Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 433 (Yeas 78 - Nays 64 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-596).
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Committee Amendment "B" (S-596) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 420 (Yeas 71 - Nays 62 - Absent 18 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-596)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment "B" (S-596) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 615 Yeas 21 - Nays 11 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended By Committee Amendment "B" (S-596) Report ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/28/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/28/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 11, 2023 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
|
|
|