Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-647) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-970) in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-647) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-970) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-647) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-970) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-970) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-647) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-647).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Subsequently, motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-647).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Speaker laid before the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-647).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-647) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 509 (Yeas 75 - Nays 66 - Absent 9 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-647)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-647) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 687 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/13/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/13/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|