Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-500) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-500) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-500) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-500) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-528)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
On motion by Senator BEEBE-CENTER of Knox The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-528).
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-528) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
On motion of Representative SALISBURY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/14/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/24/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/29/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|