Senate | 02/01/2024 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 01/30/2024 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 01/18/2024 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 01/18/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. | ||
Joint | 07/25/2023 | Carry Over Approved | ||
Joint | 06/01/2023 | Carry Over Requested | ||
Joint | 05/26/2023 | Work Session Held: TABLED | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |