House | 03/23/2023 | Assigned Pa 13'23 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/05/2023 02:04 Pm | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Approved By The Governor 04/05/2023 11:30 Am | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Presented To The Governor 03/31/2023 01:21 Pm | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 48 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 58 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/18/2023 | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Introduced By Representative Stephanie Young |