Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4032 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 6, 2023