House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 211'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:24 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/22/2023 11:18 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 09:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Immediate Effect Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Return Granted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Request Granted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Enrollment Vacated
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Senate Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 79 Yeas 94 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Nate Shannon
|
|
|