Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4084 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 27, 2023