House | 06/06/2024 | Assigned Pa 57'24 | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/06/2024 02:08 Pm | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Approved By The Governor 06/06/2024 12:08 Pm | ||
House | 06/04/2024 | Presented To The Governor 06/03/2024 04:16 Pm | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 193 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 Yeas 104 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2023 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced By Representative Curtis Vanderwall |