Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4101 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 7, 2024