House
|
05/23/2023
|
Assigned Pa 35'23
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 05/22/2023 04:52 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 05/22/2023 01:52 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 05/11/2023 11:04 Am
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 66 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 127 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment(s) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Julie Brixie
|
|
|