LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB4147
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan House Bill HB4147
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan House Bill HB4147
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 28, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 19, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 27, 2023
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 23, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 23, 2023