House
|
07/18/2023
|
Assigned Pa 67'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:26 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 07/11/2023 12:54 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/10/2023 11:18 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/27/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 95 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Substitute (h-4) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jaime Churches
|
|
|