Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 27, 2023
Bill June 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023