House | 06/20/2024 | Assigned Pa 62'24 | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/20/2024 10:58 Am | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Approved By The Governor 06/20/2024 10:00 Am | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Presented To The Governor 06/14/2024 11:34 Am | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 240 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Introduced By Representative Jay Deboyer |