Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 11, 2024
Bill November 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 13, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 20, 2024