House | 05/23/2023 | Assigned Pa 34'23 | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/22/2023 04:50 Pm | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Approved By The Governor 05/22/2023 01:50 Pm | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Presented To The Governor 05/11/2023 11:08 Am | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 145 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred To Committee On Education | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Title Amended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 Yeas 63 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar |