Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2023