House | 06/13/2023 | Assigned Pa 43'23 With Immediate Effect | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/13/2023 11:05 Am | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Approved By The Governor 06/13/2023 10:00 Am | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Presented To The Governor 06/12/2023 12:03 Pm | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 117 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Substitute (h-4) Adopted | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2023 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |