Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 6, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 7, 2023

Chaptered

Bill June 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 13, 2023