House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 243'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/30/2023 10:18 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/29/2023 05:14 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:32 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 732 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Labor
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 456 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jimmie Wilson
|
|
|