Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill November 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 1, 2023