House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 321'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/18/2023 01:04 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/18/2023 09:28 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 12/06/2023 02:36 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Conference Report Adopted By Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 655 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Conference Report Received In Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 478 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Conference Report Received
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Rep. Sarah Lightner Replaced Rep. Ann M. Bollin As Conferee 11/01/2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Rep. Felicia Brabec Replaced Rep. Rachel Hood As Conferee 11/01/2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Rep. Amos O'neal Replaced Rep. Felicia Brabec As Chair Of Conference 11/01/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Sen. Sean Mccann Replaced Sen. Rosemary Bayer As Conferee 10/31/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Sen. Sarah Anthony Replaced Sen. John Cherry As Conferee 10/31/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Conference Committee 06/08/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate Conferees Named 06/08/2023: Sens. John Cherry Rosemary Bayer Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 06/08/2023: Sens. John Cherry, Rosemary Bayer, Jon C. Bumstead
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Conferees Named 06/06/2023: Reps. Felicia Brabec Rachel Hood Ann M. Bollin
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 135 Yeas 52 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 303 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 89 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Felicia Brabec
|
|
|