Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2023