House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 275'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/08/2023 10:12 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/07/2023 10:02 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:12 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 712 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Sharon Macdonell
|
|
|