Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill October 12, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 11, 2023