House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assigned Pa 6'24
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 02/21/2024 11:04 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 02/21/2024 09:36 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 02/20/2024 03:34 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 11 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 568 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Helena Scott
|
|
|