Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2024
Bill November 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill February 21, 2024