House
|
10/03/2023
|
Assigned Pa 143'23
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/03/2023 03:38 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 10/03/2023 02:58 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 09/28/2023 04:44 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 310 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 449 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Request Granted
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Enrollment Vacated
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Senate Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 443 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Labor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter
|
|
|