Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 28, 2023
Bill June 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 27, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2023