House
|
09/06/2023
|
Disapproved Line Item(s) Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Assigned Pa 119'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 08/01/2023 09:52 Am
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Approved By The Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 07/31/2023 02:50 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/24/2023 11:15 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Conference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Conference Report Received In Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 263 Yeas 61 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Conference Report Received
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Conference Committee 06/27/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Senate Conferees Named 06/27/2023: Sens. Sarah Anthony Sean Mccann Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 06/27/2023: Sens. Sarah Anthony, Sean Mccann, Jon C. Bumstead
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
House Conferees Named 06/27/2023: Reps. Angela Witwer Amos O'neal Sarah Lightner
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 224 Yeas 52 Nays 56 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 380 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 106 Yeas 57 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Angela Witwer
|
|
|