Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4437 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 27, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill August 1, 2023