House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 215'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:32 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/22/2023 11:26 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 09:34 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 730 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Helena Scott
|
|
|