Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill June 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill November 27, 2023