Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill June 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Chaptered

Bill December 11, 2023