House | 12/31/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/31/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 720 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 275 Yeas 57 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2023 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Introduced By Representative Reggie Miller |