Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 22, 2025