House
|
07/19/2023
|
Assigned Pa 98'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2023 10:54 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 07/18/2023 11:58 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/10/2023 11:12 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 248 Yeas 81 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 381 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 80 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Will Snyder
|
|
|